FL H0725 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-22 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 530
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes certain health care practitioners to provide educational pamphlet regarding use of nonopioid alternatives for treatment of pain to certain persons electronically.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nonopioid Alternatives Educational Materials

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-09 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House Professions & Public Health Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-22HouseLaid on Table, refer to SB 530
2021-04-22HouseSubstituted SB 530
2021-04-19HouseBill added to Special Order Calendar (4/22/2021)
2021-04-13HouseAdded to Second Reading Calendar
2021-04-13HouseTemporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
2021-04-08HouseBill added to Special Order Calendar (4/13/2021)
2021-03-09HouseAdded to Second Reading Calendar
2021-03-09HouseBill released to House Calendar
2021-03-09HouseReported out of Health & Human Services Committee
2021-03-09HouseFavorable by Health & Human Services Committee
2021-03-05HouseAdded to Health & Human Services Committee agenda
2021-03-03HouseNow in Health & Human Services Committee
2021-03-03HouseReported out of Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
2021-03-03HouseFavorable by Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
2021-03-02House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-03-01HouseAdded to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee agenda
2021-02-18HouseNow in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
2021-02-18HouseReferred to Health & Human Services Committee
2021-02-18HouseReferred to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
2021-02-03HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S530 (Similar To) 2021-05-11 - Chapter No. 2021-12

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
45644Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/725
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/725/BillText/Filed/PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/725/Analyses/h0725.PPH.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/725/Analyses/h0725a.PPH.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/725/Analyses/h0725b.HHS.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/725/Analyses/h0725c.HHS.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/725/Analyses/h0725z.PPH.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/725/Analyses/h0725z1.PPH.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=57147&IsPCB=0&BillId=71229
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=57816&IsPCB=0&BillId=71229

Bill Comments 750

feedback