FL S0520 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Expanding the authorized uses of drones by law enforcement agencies and other specified entities for specified purposes, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Drones

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Rules
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-02-12SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security read 1st time
2020-02-12SenateNow in Rules
2020-02-11SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-10SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2020-02-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 02/10/20, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-11-12SenateNow in Infrastructure and Security
2019-11-12SenateFavorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 4 NAYS 1
2019-11-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 11/12/19, 10:30 am, 37 Senate Building
2019-11-01SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Infrastructure and Security; Rules
2019-10-16SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1433 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
93450Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback