FL S0516 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the schedule governing campaign finance reporting for candidates, political committees, and electioneering communications organizations; revising reporting requirements regarding transfers made by political committees and electioneering communications organizations, to conform; prohibiting a political committee or an electioneering communications organization from transferring funds to certain entities, etc.
Title
Campaign Financing
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Gruters [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Ethics and Elections |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-11-01 | Senate | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Judiciary; Rules |
2019-10-16 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
106 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
106 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
106 | 0703 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
106 | 38 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/516 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/516/BillText/Filed/HTML |