FL S0516 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creating a public records exemption for individual identifying information of a person contained in a Point-In-Time Count and Survey or data in a Homeless Management Information System; specifying that the exemption does not preclude the release of aggregate information; providing for future review and repeal under the Open Government Sunset Review Act; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.
Title
Public Records/Point-In-Time Count and Survey/Homeless Management Information System
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#27 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | House | Died in Messages |
2014-04-23 | House | In Messages |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/03/14 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/26/14, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/20/14, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-12-18 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2013-12-11 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0399 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee