FL S0512 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 15 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-12 - Now in Community Affairs
Pending: Senate Community Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring advertising platforms to collect and remit taxes for certain transactions; revising the regulated activities of public lodging establishments and public food service establishments preempted to the state to include licensing; expanding the authority of local laws, ordinances, or regulations to include requiring vacation rentals to register with local vacation rental registration programs; authorizing local governments to adopt vacation rental registration programs and impose fines for failure to register; requiring advertising platforms to require that persons placing advertisements for vacation rentals include certain information in the advertisements and attest to certain information, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vacation Rentals

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-11 - Senate - Senate Regulated Industries (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-12SenateNow in Community Affairs
2022-01-11SenateFavorable by Regulated Industries; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2022-01-11SenateIntroduced
2022-01-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 01/11/22, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2021-11-03SenateReferred to Regulated Industries; Community Affairs; Rules
2021-10-15SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S286 (Similar To) 2021-10-18 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
H325 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15927Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21203Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21208Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3161955Amended CodeSee Bill Text
404056Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4770135Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509013Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509032Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509221Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509241Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509243Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509261Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5535041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
559955Amended CodeSee Bill Text
70517Amended CodeSee Bill Text
705185Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7171355Amended CodeSee Bill Text
77521Amended CodeSee Bill Text
87724Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback