FL S0492 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing the council adjunct to the Department of Legal Affairs; requiring the department to provide administrative support to the council; specifying application of law governing advisory bodies; prescribing the composition of the council; providing duties of the council; providing for future repeal, etc.
Title
Council on the Discretionary Imposition of Criminal Justice and Traffic Fines and Fees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/09/21, 11:45 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2021-01-07 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H565 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee