FL S0492 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting the use of cellular telephones and other electronic communications devices by drivers in a school zone or school crossing or on school district property; providing penalties, etc.
Title
Driving Safety
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Transportation |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Now in Transportation |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Favorable by Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; YEAS 5 NAYS 3 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities, 03/31/15, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Transportation; Fiscal Policy |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0017 (Same As) 2015-04-28 - Died in Highway and Waterway Safety Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/492 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0492/BillText/Filed/HTML |