FL S0492 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Designates the Duval County Law Enforcement Memorial Overpass in Duval County. Directs the Department of Transportation to erect suitable markers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Road and Bridge Designations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-03-24 On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 03/29/11, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building --Not Considered
2011-03-08 Introduced -SJ 44
2011-01-25 Referred to Transportation; Budget -SJ 44
2011-01-19 Filed

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback