FL S0480 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-11-30 - Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
Pending: Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Education Committee
Hearing: Nov 30 @ 12:30 pm in 412 Knott Building
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring members of the instructional staff of public schools to provide instruction on social media literacy; defining the term "social media"; requiring district school boards to make social media literacy instructional material available online, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Required Instruction in Public Schools

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-11-30 - Senate - Senate Education (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-30SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
2021-11-30SenateFavorable by Education; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2021-11-22SenateOn Committee agenda-- Education, 11/30/21, 12:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2021-10-21SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2021-10-13SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H361 (Same As) 2021-11-05 - Now in Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100342Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback