FL H0361 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires members of instructional staff of public schools to provide instruction on social media literacy; defines "social media"; requires district school boards to make social media literacy instructional material available online.
Title
Required Instruction in Social Media Literacy
Sponsors
Sen. Clay Yarborough [R] | Rep. Fentrice Driskell [D] | Rep. Christopher Benjamin [D] | Rep. Dotie Joseph [D] |
Rep. Emily Slosberg-King [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-11-05 | House | Now in Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee |
2021-11-05 | House | Referred to Education & Employment Committee |
2021-11-05 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-11-05 | House | Referred to Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee |
2021-11-05 | House | Referred to Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee |
2021-10-20 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S480 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/361 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/361/BillText/Filed/PDF |