FL S0472 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Citing this act as the "C.V. Clay Ford/Gabriela Poole Developmental Disabilities Savings Plan"; establishing the Developmental Disabilities Savings Program to allow for advance saving for services for children who have developmental disabilities and who will be ineligible for certain services due to age; providing that the program may not be implemented until certain legal opinions are obtained; establishing the Developmental Disabilities Savings Program Board to administer the savings program; providing a sunset clause, etc.
Title
Developmental Disabilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | Senate | Died in Banking and Insurance |
2013-04-04 | Senate | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Now in Banking and Insurance |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2013-04-01 | Senate | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 04/01/13, 3:15 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0339 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee