FL S0468 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in returning Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in returning Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Redefining the term "covered policy" under the Florida Hurricane Catastrophe Fund in relation to certain collateral protection insurance policies; authorizing any association, trust, or pool created for the purpose of forming a risk management mechanism or providing self-insurance for a public entity to use communications media technology to establish a quorum and conduct public business; authorizing insurers to file certain insurance rating plans based on certain windstorm mitigation construction standards, if certain requirements are met, etc.
Title
Insurance
Sponsors
Senate Judiciary Committee | Senate Banking and Insurance Committee | Sen. Keith Perry [R] | Sen. Douglas Broxson [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#856 (Y: 94 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#825 (Y: 42 N: 71 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#3 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-01 - Senate - Senate Banking and Insurance (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#825 (Y: 42 N: 71 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#3 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-01 - Senate - Senate Banking and Insurance (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in returning Messages |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-03-10 | Senate | In returning messages |
2022-03-09 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 94, NAYS 23 |
2022-03-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-08 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2022-03-08 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Amendment 224215 adopted |
2022-03-08 | House | Amendment 221655 Failed |
2022-03-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Engrossed 1) |
2022-03-07 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/8/2022) |
2022-03-07 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2022-02-03 | House | In Messages |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2022-02-03 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (167810) |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/03/22 |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-24 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 01/27/22, 11:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2022-01-11 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time |
2022-01-11 | Senate | CS/CS by Judiciary read 1st time |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-10 | Senate | CS/CS by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/10/22, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2021-12-06 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2021-12-03 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-12-01 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2021-11-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 12/01/21, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; Appropriations |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H503 (Similar To) 2022-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 468
H959 (Similar To) 2022-05-26 - Chapter No. 2022-138
S1874 (Similar To) 2022-03-04 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 959
S1058 (Similar To) 2022-05-23 - Chapter No. 2022-132
H959 (Similar To) 2022-05-26 - Chapter No. 2022-138
S1874 (Similar To) 2022-03-04 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 959
S1058 (Similar To) 2022-05-23 - Chapter No. 2022-132
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 555 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
440 | 381 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 424 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 46227 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 221 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 856 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 865 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 8734 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 062 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 0628 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 0629 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 0665 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 351 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 421 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 701 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 712 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 7152 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 7153 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 7276 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
634 | 317 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
634 | 419 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |