FL S0462 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the State Registrar to electronically transfer a data file of permanent death certificates to the Florida Association of Court Clerks and Comptrollers, Inc.; requiring the association to submit that data file to the clerk of the circuit court, or local recording entity, for each county; requiring the clerk of the circuit court, or local recording entity, to record the permanent death certificate for each death that occurred within its respective county, etc.
Title
Death Certificates
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 04/02/13, 12:30 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2013-03-18 | Senate | CS by Health Policy read 1st time |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Now in Community Affairs |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Remaining references corrected to Community Affairs; Judiciary; Appropriations |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Original reference(s) removed: Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2013-03-14 | Senate | CS by Health Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/14/13, 8:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Community Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0173 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 222 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
382 | 008 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |