FL S0452 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Proposing amendments to the State Constitution to increase the period when the accrued benefit from specified limitations on homestead property tax assessments may be transferred from a prior homestead to a new homestead, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Limitations on Homestead Property Tax Assessments

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-05SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax
2017-12-05SenateFavorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2017-11-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 12/05/17, 10:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building
2017-10-25SenateReferred to Community Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations
2017-10-09SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S454 (Related) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax
H501 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Ways and Means Committee
H503 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Ways and Means Committee

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback