FL S0448 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Citing this act as the "Providing Equity in Telemedicine Services (PETS) Act"; defining the term "telemedicine"; authorizing veterinarians to practice telemedicine; requiring veterinarians using telemedicine to establish a veterinarian/client/patient relationship and meet certain professional standards; authorizing employees, agents, or contractors of animal control authorities to administer rabies vaccinations under certain circumstances; providing that a supervising veterinarian assumes responsibility for any person vaccinating animals at the supervising veterinarian's discretion or under his or her supervision, etc.
Title
Veterinary Telehealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Regulated Industries |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-02-07 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 02/10/22, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building --Not Received |
2022-02-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 02/08/22, 12:30 pm, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2022-01-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 01/18/22, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Agriculture; Rules |
2021-10-12 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H723 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Rules
H667 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 714
H667 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 714
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
474 | 202 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
474 | 2021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
474 | 203 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
474 | 214 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
828 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |