FL S0434 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Chapter No. 2022-92
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Chapter No. 2022-92
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Delaying the scheduled repeal of provisions governing the Florida Tourism Industry Marketing Corporation and the Division of Tourism Marketing of Enterprise Florida, Inc., respectively, etc.
Title
Florida Tourism Marketing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#11 (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#649 (Y: 98 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#18 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Tourism (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#649 (Y: 98 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#18 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Tourism (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-06 | Chapter No. 2022-92 | |
2022-05-06 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-05-03 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed as amended; YEAS 36 NAYS 3 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (268607) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | In returning messages |
2022-03-02 | House | Passed as amended; YEAS 98, NAYS 17 |
2022-03-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-01 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2022-03-01 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2022-03-01 | House | Amendment 268607 adopted |
2022-03-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-01 | House | Substituted for HB 489 |
2022-02-24 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/1/2022) |
2022-02-22 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2022-02-22 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading |
2022-02-17 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-02-17 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/22/2022) |
2022-02-17 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2022-02-03 | House | In Messages |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 1 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/03/22 |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-24 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 01/27/22, 11:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2021-11-02 | Senate | Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2021-10-25 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 11/02/21, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations |
2021-10-12 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H489 (Similar To) 2022-03-01 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 434
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
288 | 1226 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 923 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |