FL S0422 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on October 1 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 343
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Preempting to the Department of Health the regulatory authority for permitting standards; providing standards for a damaged or destroyed recreational vehicle park to be rebuilt under certain circumstances; authorizing a park operator to refuse access to the premises and to eject transient guests or visitors based on specified conduct; providing for ejection from a park and specifying grounds and requirements therefor, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recreational Vehicle Industries

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 343
2020-03-11SenateSubstituted CS/CS/HB 343
2020-03-11SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-09SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/11/20
2020-02-27SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-02-26SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2020-02-21SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/26/20, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building
2020-02-19SenateCS/CS by Innovation, Industry, and Technology read 1st time
2020-02-19SenateNow in Rules
2020-02-19SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-17SenateCS/CS by Innovation, Industry, and Technology; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2020-02-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Innovation, Industry, and Technology, 02/17/20, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-01-30SenateNow in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
2020-01-29SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security read 1st time
2020-01-29SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-01-27SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2020-01-22SenateOn Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 01/27/20, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-10-15SenateReferred to Infrastructure and Security; Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Rules
2019-10-01SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H343 (Same As) 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-126
H647 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
S772 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
H921 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-135

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
513012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
51302Amended CodeSee Bill Text
513051Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5131115Amended CodeSee Bill Text
513112Amended CodeSee Bill Text
513115Amended CodeSee Bill Text
513118Amended CodeSee Bill Text
51313Amended CodeSee Bill Text
52701Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5270201Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback