FL H0647 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Introduced on November 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to recreational vehicle parks, including permit application, preemption, rebuilding of park, abandoned property, ejection of certain persons, removal of property from park, & immunity from liability; provides that certain surf pools are exempt from supervision & regulation by DOH until DOH adopts rules.
Title
Regulation of Recreational Activities
Sponsors
House Health and Human Services Committee | House Civil Justice Subcommittee | House Health Quality Subcommittee | Rep. Brad Drake [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died on Calendar |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-14 | House | CS/CS/CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time |
2020-02-14 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-12 | House | CS/CS/CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-10 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/12/20, 10:00 am, Morris Hall |
2020-02-06 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | CS/CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee read 1st time |
2020-02-05 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-04 | House | CS/CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 1 |
2020-01-31 | House | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 02/04/20, 3:30 pm, Sumner Hall |
2020-01-29 | House | Now in Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2020-01-28 | House | CS by Health Quality Subcommittee read 1st time |
2020-01-28 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-01-28 | House | CS by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-24 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 01/28/20, 9:00 am, Mashburn Hall |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-12-03 | House | Referred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Civil Justice Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-11-15 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S772 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
S922 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Messages
H343 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-126
S422 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 343
H1143 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
H713 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-133
S922 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Messages
H343 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-126
S422 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 343
H1143 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
H713 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-133
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
513 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
513 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
513 | 051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
513 | 1115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
513 | 112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
513 | 115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
513 | 118 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
513 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
514 | 0115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
553 | 77 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |