FL H0921 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-135
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-135
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revising application of agricultural load securing requirements; requiring the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services to adopt rules specifying requirements for agents to administer certain competency examinations and establishing a competency examination for a license to engage in activities solely related to the service and repair of recreational vehicles; extending the scheduled expiration for the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services' use of funds from the Pest Control Trust Fund for certain duties of the department; directing the Florida Forest Service to develop a training curriculum for wildland firefighters; authorizing the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services to revoke an aquaculture certificate of registration under certain conditions, etc.
Title
Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services
Sponsors
House State Affairs Committee | House Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee | Rep. Chuck Brannan [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-13 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#761 (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#13 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#609 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#13 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#609 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | Chapter No. 2020-135 | |
2020-06-29 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-17 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2020-03-13 | House | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled |
2020-03-13 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 111 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-13 | House | Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (158898) |
2020-03-13 | House | In returning messages |
2020-03-13 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (158898) |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 1514 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Withdrawn from Agriculture; Appropriations |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Received |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture; Appropriations |
2020-03-09 | Senate | In Messages |
2020-03-09 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 118 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-09 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (617843) |
2020-03-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-06 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-06 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (749531) |
2020-03-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-03 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20 |
2020-03-02 | House | CS/CS by State Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2020-03-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-28 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-27 | House | CS/CS by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 22 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-26 | House | CS by Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee read 1st time |
2020-02-25 | House | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 02/27/20, 8:00 am, Morris Hall |
2020-02-25 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2020-02-25 | House | CS referred to State Affairs Committee |
2020-02-25 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2020-02-25 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-25 | House | CS by Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-21 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee, 02/25/20, 10:00 am, 12 HOB |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-12-12 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2019-12-11 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1514 (Same As) 2020-03-12 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 921
H5401 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
H5003 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Chapter No. 2020-114
H395 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
H343 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-126
S422 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 343
H1063 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/CS/CS/SB 1876 passed
S1876 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in returning Messages
H5401 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
H5003 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Chapter No. 2020-114
H395 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
H343 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-126
S422 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 343
H1063 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/CS/CS/SB 1876 passed
S1876 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in returning Messages
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
316 | 520 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
527 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
527 | 0201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
570 | 441 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
581 | 217 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
590 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
597 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
633 | 408 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |