FL S0416 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring Citizens Property Insurance Corporation to submit a biannual report on the number of residential sinkhole policies requested, issued, and declined; prohibiting the corporation from requiring a policyholder to advance payment for stabilization repairs provided under the program; providing requirements and procedures for selecting stabilization repair contractors to conduct stabilization repairs; specifying additional parameters with respect to the program, including provision for resolving disputes between the corporation and a policyholder, etc.
Title
Sinkhole Coverage
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; YEAS 10 NAYS 3 |
2014-03-07 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government, 03/12/14, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2014-03-04 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-02-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government, 03/05/14, 11:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building --Amendments Adopted - Temporarily Postponed |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 11 NAYS 1 |
2014-01-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 02/04/14, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2014-01-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/14/14, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2013-12-11 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations |
2013-11-19 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0129 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
627 | 351 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 706 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |