FL S0412 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring that courts in a judicial circuit in which a residential eviction mediation program has been established refer matters involving a residential eviction to mediation; restricting availability of a specified summary procedure in actions where a landlord is seeking to recover possession of a residential unit; removing the requirement that a residential tenant defending against a landlord's action for possession pay accrued rent to the registry of the court, etc.
Title
Residential Tenancies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Community Affairs; Rules |
2021-01-04 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H6025 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
H481 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
S1090 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Judiciary
H481 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
S1090 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Judiciary
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
44 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
83 | 56 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
83 | 59 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
83 | 60 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
83 | 61 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/412 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/412/BillText/Filed/HTML |