FL H6025 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removes requirement that certain money be paid into registry of court.
Title
Payments Made into the Registry of the Court
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-01-22 | House | Referred to Civil Justice and Property Rights Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2021-01-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S412 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Judiciary
H481 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
S1090 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Judiciary
H481 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
S1090 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Judiciary
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/6025 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/6025/BillText/Filed/PDF |