FL S0392 | 2018 | Regular Session


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]


Increasing the age of a child at which a state attorney may, or is required to, request a court to transfer the child to adult court for criminal prosecution; increasing the age of a child at which a state attorney may, or is required to, file an information against the child for prosecution as an adult, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Juvenile Justice



2018-03-10SenateDied in Criminal Justice
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/06/18, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building --Not Considered
2017-10-25SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules

Same As/Similar To

S1552 (Similar To) 2018-03-16 - Signed by Officers and presented to Governor

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
98515Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98526Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985265Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985556Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985557Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985565Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

Bill Comments