FL S0388 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing the office within the Executive Office of the Governor; providing for the appointment of a Chief Diversity Officer; providing the duties of the Chief Diversity Officer, including creation of a strategic plan that must be periodically updated and the review of certain agency programs and policies, etc.
Title
Office of Diversity, Equity, and Inclusion
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations |
2021-10-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H221 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/388 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/388/BillText/Filed/HTML |