FL S0376 | 2018 | Regular Session


Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 5 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-03-12 - Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]


Providing that, under certain circumstances, posttraumatic stress disorder suffered by a first responder is an occupational disease compensable by workers' compensation benefits; specifying that benefits do not require a physical injury and are not subject to certain apportionment or limitations, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Workers' Compensation Benefits for First Responders


Roll Calls

2018-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#807 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]


2018-03-12 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2018-03-05SenateOrdered enrolled
2018-03-05HouseCS passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0
2018-03-05HouseRead 3rd time
2018-03-05HouseRead 2nd time
2018-03-05HouseSubstituted for CS/CS/CS/HB 227
2018-03-04HouseReferred to Calendar
2018-03-03HouseIn Messages
2018-03-03SenateCS passed; YEAS 33 NAYS 0
2018-03-03SenateRead 3rd time
2018-03-02SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-02SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/18
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-01SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2018-02-28SenateCS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
2018-02-28SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/01/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2018-02-28SenateNow in Rules
2018-02-28SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-02-27SenateCS/CS by Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
2018-02-22SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/27/18, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2018-01-17SenateNow in Appropriations
2018-01-16SenateFavorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2018-01-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/16/18, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateCS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
2017-12-13SenateNow in Commerce and Tourism
2017-12-07SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2017-12-05SenateCS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2017-11-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 12/05/17, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2017-10-25SenateReferred to Banking and Insurance; Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations; Rules

Same As/Similar To

S126 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Banking and Insurance
H227 (Same As) 2018-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 376
H629 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1121815Amended CodeSee Bill Text
440093Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

Bill Comments