FL H0629 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Revises burden of proof to demonstrate mental or nervous injury involving first responders for workers' compensation claims; provides that benefits may be paid even if there is no physical injury.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workers' Compensation for First Responders

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-11-27HouseReferred to Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee
2017-11-13HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S126 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Banking and Insurance
H227 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 376
S376 (Similar To) 2018-03-28 - Chapter No. 2018-124

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1121815Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback