FL S0126 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the standard by which a mental or nervous injury must be demonstrated for purposes of determining eligibility for benefits for employment-related accidents and injuries; removing the limitation that only medical benefits are payable for a mental or nervous injury unaccompanied by a physical injury; revising eligibility for certain payments provided under the Workers' Compensation Law, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workers' Compensation for First Responders

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Banking and Insurance
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-08-28SenateReferred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations; Rules
2017-08-09SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S376 (Similar To) 2018-03-28 - Chapter No. 2018-124
H227 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 376
H629 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1121815Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback