FL S0356 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing a sales tax exemption for certain ENERGY STAR and WaterSense products during a specified timeframe; defining terms; authorizing the Department of Revenue to adopt emergency rules, etc.
Title
Sales Tax Holiday for ENERGY STAR and WaterSense Products
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate Finance and Tax (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-30 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Tourism (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-11-30 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Tourism (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2022-01-27 | Senate | CS by Finance and Tax read 1st time |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2022-01-27 | Senate | CS by Finance and Tax; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-24 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 01/27/22, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-11-30 | Senate | Now in Finance and Tax |
2021-11-30 | Senate | Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2021-11-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 11/30/21, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2021-09-27 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H201 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Commerce Committee
H7071 (Similar To) 2022-05-06 - Chapter No. 2022-97
H7071 (Similar To) 2022-05-06 - Chapter No. 2022-97