FL S0348 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Military Affairs and Domestic Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1003 (Ch. 2010-177)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Military Affairs and Domestic Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1003 (Ch. 2010-177)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts certain veterans' organizations from requirements to file registration statements with the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services.
Title
Solicitation of Funds/Veterans' Organizations [GPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Military Affairs and Domestic Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1003 (Ch. 2010-177) | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Military Affairs and Domestic Security; Commerce; General Government Appropriations -SJ 00032 | |
2009-12-09 | Referred to Military Affairs and Domestic Security; Commerce; General Government Appropriations | |
2009-10-07 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1003 (Similar To) 2010-06-01 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-177
S1972 (Similar To) 2010-04-28 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00983; Substituted CS/HB 1003 -SJ 00983; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1003 (Ch. 2010-177) -SJ 00983
S1972 (Similar To) 2010-04-28 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00983; Substituted CS/HB 1003 -SJ 00983; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1003 (Ch. 2010-177) -SJ 00983