FL S0344 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifying the procedure for the nomination and appointment of regional counsels; specifying the number of candidates that must be nominated when a current regional counsel does not apply for reappointment, etc.
Title
Regional Counsels
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Steube [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Ethics and Elections |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Now in Ethics and Elections |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2017-01-30 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/07/17, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Ethics and Elections; Rules |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/344 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/0344/BillText/Filed/HTML |