FL S0340 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Chapter No. 2016-69
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Chapter No. 2016-69
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that a health insurer, a prepaid limited health service organization, and a health maintenance organization, respectively, may not require a licensed ophthalmologist or optometrist to join a network solely for the purpose of credentialing the licensee for another vision network; providing that such insurers and organizations may not restrict a licensed ophthalmologist, optometrist, or optician to specific suppliers of materials or optical laboratories, etc.
Title
Vision Care Plans
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Latvala [R] | Sen. Don Gaetz [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#654 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-23 | Chapter No. 2016-69 | |
2016-03-23 | Approved by Governor | |
2016-03-08 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2016-03-02 | House | Passed; YEAS 117 NAYS 0 |
2016-03-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-01 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-03-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-01 | House | Substituted for HB 337 |
2016-02-26 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/16 |
2016-02-25 | House | Received |
2016-02-25 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2016-01-21 | House | In Messages |
2016-01-15 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 34 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/13/16 |
2015-12-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-12-03 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2015-11-23 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 12/03/15, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2015-11-18 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2015-11-17 | Senate | Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2015-11-09 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 11/17/15, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2015-10-21 | Senate | Now in Health Policy |
2015-10-20 | Senate | Favorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2015-10-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 10/20/15, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2015-10-06 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Health Policy; Rules |
2015-09-23 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0337 (Same As) 2016-03-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 340 (Ch. 2016-69)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
627 | 6474 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
636 | 035 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 315 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |