FL H0337 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on October 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 340 (Ch. 2016-69)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 340 (Ch. 2016-69)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that health insurer, prepaid limited health service organization, & HMO may not require licensed ophthalmologist or optometrist to join network solely for credentialing licensee for another vision network; provides that such insurers & organizations may not restrict licensed ophthalmologist, optometrist, or optician to specific suppliers of materials or optical laboratories.
Title
Vision Care Plans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-01 | House | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 340 (Ch. 2016-69) |
2016-03-01 | House | Substituted SB 340 |
2016-02-26 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/16 |
2016-01-27 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-01-27 | House | Favorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-25 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 01/27/16, 9:00 am, Morris Hall |
2016-01-15 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2016-01-13 | House | Favorable by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2016-01-11 | House | On Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 01/13/16, 1:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2015-12-02 | House | Now in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee |
2015-12-02 | House | Favorable by Health Innovation Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2015-11-24 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Innovation Subcommittee, 12/02/15, 11:30 am, 306 HOB |
2015-10-30 | House | Referred to Health Innovation Subcommittee; Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2015-10-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0340 (Same As) 2016-03-23 - Chapter No. 2016-69
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
627 | 6474 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
636 | 035 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 315 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/337 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/0337/BillText/Filed/PDF |