FL S0336 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00689; Amendment(s) adopted (842346) -SJ 00689; Substituted CS/HB 91 -SJ 00689; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 91 (Ch. 2010-31), CS/SB 962 (Ch. 2010-207) -SJ 00689
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00689; Amendment(s) adopted (842346) -SJ 00689; Substituted CS/HB 91 -SJ 00689; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 91 (Ch. 2010-31), CS/SB 962 (Ch. 2010-207) -SJ 00689
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that the central abuse hotline, which is maintained by the Department of Children and Family Services, immediately transfer reports relating to vulnerable adults to the appropriate county sheriff's office. Authorizes the department to file a petition to determine incapacity. Prohibits the department from acting as guardian or providing legal counsel to the guardian, etc.
Title
Adult Protective Services [SPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00689; Amendment(s) adopted (842346) -SJ 00689; Substituted CS/HB 91 -SJ 00689; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 91 (Ch. 2010-31), CS/SB 962 (Ch. 2010-207) -SJ 00689 | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 00551 | |
2010-04-13 | Favorable by- Health and Human Services Appropriations; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 00551 | |
2010-04-08 | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Appropriations, 04/13/10, 2:45 pm, 110-S | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Health and Human Services Appropriations -SJ 00032; On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 01/13/10, 10:00 am, 401-S; Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 00162; Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability -SJ 00163; On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/02/10, 10:30 am, 110-S; CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 00164; CS read 1st time on 03/02/10 -SJ 00153; Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute); Now in Health and Human Services Appropriations -SJ 00164 | |
2010-02-08 | Now in Health and Human Services Appropriations | |
2010-02-03 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-02-02 | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 | |
2010-01-25 | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/02/10, 10:30 am, 110-S | |
2010-01-14 | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability | |
2010-01-13 | Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 | |
2010-01-04 | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 01/13/10, 10:00 am, 401-S | |
2009-12-09 | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Health and Human Services Appropriations | |
2009-10-06 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0479 (Similar To) 2010-04-27 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted CS/SB 962; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 962 (Ch. 2010-207), CS/HB 91 (Ch. 2010-31) -HJ 01170
H0091 (Similar To) 2010-05-07 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-31; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 962 (Ch. 2010-207)
S0962 (Similar To) 2010-06-07 - Chapter No. 2010-207
H0091 (Similar To) 2010-05-07 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-31; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 962 (Ch. 2010-207)
S0962 (Similar To) 2010-06-07 - Chapter No. 2010-207
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0322 | 142 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0415 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0415 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0415 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0415 | 1051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0435 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0943 | 0585 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0943 | 059 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |