FL H0091 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-07 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-31; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 962 (Ch. 2010-207)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Revises legislative intent with respect to adult protective services; provides for care & protection of all vulnerable adults; provides for certain suspected abuse cases to be transferred to local county sheriff's office; provides for DCFS to file petition to determine incapacity & guardianship; authorizes DHSMV to provide copies of drivers' license files to DCFS to conduct protective investigations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adult Protective Services [SPSC]

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-22 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0035 - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House Roll Call No. 0831 - Passage (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-07 Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-31; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 962 (Ch. 2010-207)
2010-04-30 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor -HJ 01700
2010-04-23 Ordered enrolled -HJ 01032
2010-04-22 Read 3rd time -SJ 00732; CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 -SJ 00732
2010-04-21 In Messages; Received -SJ 00716; Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Health and Human Services Appropriations -SJ 00716; Withdrawn from Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Health and Human Services Appropriations -SJ 00689; Substituted for CS/SB 336 -SJ 00689; Read 2nd time -SJ 00689
2010-04-21 Read 3rd time -HJ 00796; CS passed; YEAS 113 NAYS 0 -HJ 00796
2010-04-20 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00774
2010-04-06 Favorable by- Health & Family Services Policy Council; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 00610; Placed on Calendar -HJ 00610
2010-04-02 On Council agenda-- Health & Family Services Policy Council, 04/06/10, 9:00 am, Webster Hall
2010-03-26 Favorable by Health Care Appropriations (CGHC); YEAS 9 NAYS 0 -HJ 00408; Now in Health & Family Services Policy Council -HJ 00408
2010-03-24 On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations (CGHC), 03/26/10, 8:30 am, Webster Hall
2010-03-09 Favorable by Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP); YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -HJ 00259; Now in Health Care Appropriations (CGHC) -HJ 00259
2010-03-05 On Committee agenda-- Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP), 03/09/10, 8:00 am, 404-H
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Elder & Family Services Policy (HFPC); Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP); Health Care Appropriations (CGHC); Health & Family Services Policy Council -HJ 00015; On Committee agenda-- Elder & Family Services Policy (HFPC), 01/21/10, 9:00 am, 24-H; CS by Elder & Family Services Policy (HFPC); YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -HJ 00167; CS read 1st time on 03/02/10 -HJ 00155; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20; Now in Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP) -HJ 00163
2010-02-02 Now in Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP)
2010-01-27 Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20
2010-01-21 CS by Elder & Family Services Policy (HFPC); YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2010-01-14 On Committee agenda-- Elder & Family Services Policy (HFPC), 01/21/10, 9:00 am, 24-H
2009-10-01 Referred to Elder & Family Services Policy (HFPC); Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP); Health Care Appropriations (CGHC); Health & Family Services Policy Council
2009-09-01 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H0479 (Similar To) 2010-04-27 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted CS/SB 962; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 962 (Ch. 2010-207), CS/HB 91 (Ch. 2010-31) -HJ 01170
S0336 (Similar To) 2010-04-21 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00689; Amendment(s) adopted (842346) -SJ 00689; Substituted CS/HB 91 -SJ 00689; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 91 (Ch. 2010-31), CS/SB 962 (Ch. 2010-207) -SJ 00689
S0962 (Similar To) 2010-06-07 - Chapter No. 2010-207

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
0322142Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0415101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0415102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0415103Amended CodeSee Bill Text
04151051Amended CodeSee Bill Text
043504Amended CodeSee Bill Text
09430585Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0943059Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback