FL S0328 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on May 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-17 - Chapter No. 2024-188, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7073 (Ch. 2024-158)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on May 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-17 - Chapter No. 2024-188, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7073 (Ch. 2024-158)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting counties and municipalities, respectively, from restricting the floor area ratio of certain proposed developments under certain circumstances; authorizing counties and municipalities, respectively, to restrict the height of proposed developments under certain circumstances; requiring counties and municipalities, respectively, to maintain a certain policy on their websites; revising conditions for when multifamily projects are considered property used for a charitable purpose and are eligible to receive an ad valorem property tax exemption, etc.
Title
Affordable Housing
Sponsors
Senate Fiscal Policy Committee | Senate Community Affairs Committee | Sen. Alexis Calatayud [R] | Sen. Rosalind Osgood [D] |
Sen. Linda Stewart [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#721 (Y: 112 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate Fiscal Policy (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-09 - Senate - Senate Community Affairs (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate Fiscal Policy (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-09 - Senate - Senate Community Affairs (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-17 | Chapter No. 2024-188, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7073 (Ch. 2024-158) | |
2024-05-16 | Approved by Governor | |
2024-05-07 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2024-02-28 | House | CS passed; YEAS 112, NAYS 1 |
2024-02-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-27 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2024-02-27 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2024-02-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-27 | House | Substituted for CS/CS/HB 1239 |
2024-02-22 | House | 1st Reading (Engrossed 1) |
2024-02-22 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/27/2024) |
2024-02-22 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2024-02-07 | House | In Messages |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2024-02-07 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (155140, 204708) |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-01 | Senate | CS/CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/07/24 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2024-01-31 | Senate | CS/CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 |
2024-01-26 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 01/31/24, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2024-01-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 01/18/24, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Now in Fiscal Policy |
2024-01-10 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs read 1st time |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2024-01-09 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/09/24, 4:30 pm, 401 Senate Building |
2024-01-04 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Fiscal Policy |
2024-01-04 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1239 (Same As) 2024-02-27 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 328
S386 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Community Affairs
S7074 (Similar To) 2024-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7073
H7073 (Similar To) 2024-05-08 - Chapter No. 2024-158; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 328 (Ch. 2024-188)
S386 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Community Affairs
S7074 (Similar To) 2024-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7073
H7073 (Similar To) 2024-05-08 - Chapter No. 2024-158; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 328 (Ch. 2024-188)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
125 | 01055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
166 | 04151 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
196 | 1978 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
196 | 1979 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
333 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 507 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 5096 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 518 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |