FL S0312 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/29/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
Pending: Senate Banking and Insurance Committee
Hearing: Mar 29 @ 8:30 am in 412 Knott Building
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revising restrictions on the use of genetic information for insurance purposes by life insurers and long-term care insurers; specifying a restriction on and an authorized use of genetic information for insurance purposes by disability income insurers; providing that certain restrictions against unfair discrimination or unlawful rebates do not include value-added products or services offered or provided by insurers or their agents if certain conditions are met; providing requirements for and restrictions on insurers or agents offering or providing such products or services, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-24SenateOn Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/29/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
2023-03-07SenateIntroduced
2023-01-26SenateReferred to Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; Rules
2023-01-20SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1111 (Same As) 2023-03-24 - Now in Commerce Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6269541Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6274301Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback