FL S0308 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 225 (Ch. 2023-97), CS/SB 190 (Ch. 2023-113)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 225 (Ch. 2023-97), CS/SB 190 (Ch. 2023-113)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing charter school students and Florida Virtual School full-time students to participate in extracurricular activities at a private school under certain circumstances; authorizing charter school students to participate in interscholastic extracurricular activities at a private school under certain circumstances; deleting a requirement that the appointing authority of members of the FHSAA Board of Directors make appointments that reflect the demographic and population trends of this state; providing that all appointed board members be appointed by the Governor and confirmed by the Senate, etc.
Title
Interscholastic Activities
Sponsors
Senate Rules Committee | Senate Education Pre-K -12 Committee | Sen. Jay Collins [R] | Sen. Erin Grall [R] |
Sen. Keith Perry [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate Education Pre-K -12 (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate Education Pre-K -12 (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-03 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 225 (Ch. 2023-97), CS/SB 190 (Ch. 2023-113) |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/HB 225 |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-03-31 | Senate | CS/CS by Rules read 1st time |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/03/23 |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2023-03-30 | Senate | CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 5 |
2023-03-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/30/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2023-03-08 | Senate | CS by Education Pre-K -12 read 1st time |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Remaining references corrected to Rules |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Original reference(s) removed: Judiciary |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-03-06 | Senate | CS by Education Pre-K -12; YEAS 9 NAYS 3 |
2023-02-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K -12, 03/06/23, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Education Pre-K -12; Judiciary; Rules |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H225 (Similar To) 2023-05-18 - Chapter No. 2023-97; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 190 (Ch. 2023-113)
H259 (Similar To) 2023-04-20 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 225 (Ch. 2023-97), CS/SB 190 (Ch. 2023-113)
S190 (Similar To) 2023-05-25 - Chapter No. 2023-113, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 225 (Ch. 2023-97)
H259 (Similar To) 2023-04-20 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 225 (Ch. 2023-97), CS/SB 190 (Ch. 2023-113)
S190 (Similar To) 2023-05-25 - Chapter No. 2023-113, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 225 (Ch. 2023-97)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 185 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 195 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |