FL S0306 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the definition of the term "developmental disability" to include fetal alcohol spectrum disorders; defining the term "fetal alcohol spectrum disorders", etc.
Title
Fetal Alcohol Spectrum Disorders
Sponsors
Senate Children, Families, and Elder Affairs Committee | Sen. Lori Berman [D] | Sen. Keith Perry [R] | Sen. Randolph Bracy [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Children, Families, and Elder Affairs (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2022-02-09 | Senate | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 02/08/22, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Building |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2021-09-22 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H93 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 394 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
393 | 063 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |