FL H0093 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises definition of term "developmental disability" to include fetal alcohol spectrum disorders; defines term "fetal alcohol spectrum disorders"; requires APD to allow certain individuals diagnosed with fetal alcohol spectrum disorders to receive home & community-based services.
Title
Fetal Alcohol Spectrum Disorders
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-09-22 | House | Now in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee |
2021-09-22 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-09-22 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2021-09-22 | House | Referred to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee |
2021-09-13 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S306 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 394 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
393 | 063 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
393 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/93 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/93/BillText/Filed/PDF |