FL S0290 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Chapter No. 2015-44
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Chapter No. 2015-44
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Providing an exemption from criminal penalties for carrying a concealed weapon or a concealed firearm when evacuating pursuant to a mandatory evacuation order during a declared state of emergency, etc.
Title
Carrying a Concealed Weapon or a Concealed Firearm
Sponsors
Senate Rules Committee | Senate Criminal Justice Committee | Sen. Jeffrey Brandes [R] | Sen. Rob Bradley [R] |
Sen. Greg Evers [R] | Sen. Joe Negron [R] | Sen. Kelli Stargel [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#117 (Y: 86 N: 26 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#7 (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#7 (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-22 | Chapter No. 2015-44 | |
2015-05-21 | Approved by Governor | |
2015-05-07 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2015-04-09 | House | CS passed; YEAS 86 NAYS 26 |
2015-04-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-08 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-04-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-08 | House | Substituted for CS/CS/HB 493 |
2015-04-06 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/08/15 |
2015-04-02 | House | Received |
2015-04-02 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2015-04-01 | House | In Messages |
2015-03-24 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 29 NAYS 10 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-17 | Senate | CS/CS by Rules read 1st time |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/18/15 |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-03-12 | Senate | CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 10 NAYS 2 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/12/15, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 1 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/04/15, 1:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Now in Community Affairs |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-02-16 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 4 NAYS 1 |
2015-02-09 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/16/15, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Community Affairs; Rules |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0493 (Same As) 2015-04-08 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 290 (Ch. 2015-44)
S0822 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Criminal Justice, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 290 (Ch. 2015-44)
H1273 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 290 (Ch. 2015-44)
S0822 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Criminal Justice, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 290 (Ch. 2015-44)
H1273 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 290 (Ch. 2015-44)