FL H0493 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-08 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 290 (Ch. 2015-44)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-08 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 290 (Ch. 2015-44)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides exemption from criminal penalties for carrying concealed weapon or concealed firearm while in act of evacuating pursuant to mandatory evacuation order during declared state of emergency.
Title
Carrying a Concealed Weapon or Concealed Firearm
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-08 | House | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 290 (Ch. 2015-44) |
2015-04-08 | House | Substituted CS/CS/SB 290 |
2015-04-06 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/08/15 |
2015-03-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-03-12 | House | CS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time |
2015-03-12 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2015-03-11 | House | CS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 1 |
2015-03-09 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 03/11/15, 1:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2015-03-05 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2015-03-05 | House | CS referred to Judiciary Committee |
2015-03-05 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee |
2015-03-04 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time |
2015-03-04 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2015-03-04 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 2 |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-03-02 | House | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 03/04/15, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2015-02-05 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2015-01-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0290 (Same As) 2015-05-22 - Chapter No. 2015-44
S0822 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Criminal Justice, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 290 (Ch. 2015-44)
H1273 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 290 (Ch. 2015-44)
S0822 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Criminal Justice, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 290 (Ch. 2015-44)
H1273 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 290 (Ch. 2015-44)