FL S0288 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 4 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-04 - Ordered enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on March 4 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-04 - Ordered enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the definition of the term "electronic dissemination", etc.
Title
Electronic Dissemination of Commercial Recordings and Audiovisual Works
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#749 (Y: 112 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#15 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Tourism (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#15 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Tourism (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2022-03-04 | House | Passed; YEAS 112, NAYS 1 |
2022-03-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-03 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2022-03-03 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2022-03-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-03 | House | Substituted for HB 33 |
2022-02-28 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-02-28 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/3/2022) |
2022-02-28 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2022-02-03 | House | In Messages |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/03/22 |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-24 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/27/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/18/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2021-11-02 | Senate | Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2021-10-25 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 11/02/21, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Judiciary; Rules |
2021-09-22 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H33 (Same As) 2022-03-03 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 288