FL S0264 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Ratifying the proposed amendment to the Constitution of the United States relating to equal rights for men and women, etc.
Title
Equal Rights for Men and Women
Sponsors
Sen. Audrey Gibson [D] | Sen. Linda Stewart [D] | Sen. Lauren Book [D] | Sen. Jose Rodriguez [D] |
Sen. Annette Taddeo [D] | Sen. Kevin Rader [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-09-22 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Commerce and Tourism; Rules |
2017-09-07 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H103 (Similar To) 2017-11-02 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
H1161 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Public Integrity and Ethics Committee
H1161 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Public Integrity and Ethics Committee
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/264 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/264/BillText/Filed/HTML |