FL S0260 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing criteria for veterans of the Armed Services of the United States, including reserve components thereof, to qualify as residents for tuition purposes, etc.
Title
Resident Status for Tuition Purposes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | Senate | Died in Education |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Now in Education |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Favorable by Military Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2013-01-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Military Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 02/06/13, 10:30 am, 37 Senate Office Building |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Military Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2013-01-11 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0539 (Same As) 2013-05-03 - Died in Higher Education and Workforce Subcommittee
H7051 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Education
H7051 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Education