FL H0539 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 23-2)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Higher Education and Workforce Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 23-2)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Higher Education and Workforce Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides criteria for veterans of U.S. Armed Services, including reserve components thereof, to qualify as residents for tuition purposes.
Title
Resident Status for Tuition Purposes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | House | Died in Higher Education and Workforce Subcommittee |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-02-06 | House | Referred to Higher Education and Workforce Subcommittee; Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2013-01-24 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/539 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0539/BillText/Filed/PDF |