FL S0254 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Chapter No. 2023-90
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Chapter No. 2023-90
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Granting courts of this state temporary emergency jurisdiction over a child present in this state if the child has been subjected to or is threatened with being subjected to sex-reassignment prescriptions or procedures; providing that, for purposes of warrants to take physical custody of a child in certain child custody enforcement proceedings, serious physical harm to the child includes, but is not limited to, being subjected to sex-reassignment prescriptions or procedures; prohibiting certain public entities from expending state funds for the provision of sex-reassignment prescriptions or procedures; prohibiting sex-reassignment prescriptions and procedures for patients younger than 18 years of age; requiring the department to immediately suspend the license of a health care practitioner who is arrested for committing or attempting, soliciting, or conspiring to commit specified violations related to sex-reassignment prescriptions or procedures for a patient younger than 18 years of age, etc.
Title
Treatments for Sex Reassignment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#482 (Y: 83 N: 28 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#18 (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#138 (Y: 82 N: 31 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#128 (Y: 28 N: 82 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#127 (Y: 28 N: 82 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#126 (Y: 32 N: 82 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#125 (Y: 31 N: 82 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#124 (Y: 27 N: 81 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Senate Fiscal Policy (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate Health Policy (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#18 (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#138 (Y: 82 N: 31 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#128 (Y: 28 N: 82 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#127 (Y: 28 N: 82 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#126 (Y: 32 N: 82 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#125 (Y: 31 N: 82 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#124 (Y: 27 N: 81 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Senate Fiscal Policy (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate Health Policy (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-18 | Chapter No. 2023-90 | |
2023-05-17 | Approved by Governor | |
2023-05-16 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled |
2023-05-04 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 83, NAYS 28 |
2023-05-04 | House | Amendment 738500 Concur |
2023-05-04 | House | Added to Senate Message List |
2023-05-04 | House | In Messages |
2023-05-04 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 26 NAYS 13 |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Concurred in House amendment(s) as amended (256341) |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Amendment(s) to House amendment(s) adopted (738500) |
2023-04-19 | Senate | In returning messages |
2023-04-19 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 82, NAYS 31 |
2023-04-19 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-18 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2023-04-18 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2023-04-18 | House | Amendment 984929 ruled out of order |
2023-04-18 | House | Amendment 256341 adopted |
2023-04-18 | House | Amendment 063349 Failed |
2023-04-18 | House | Amendment 829593 Failed |
2023-04-18 | House | Amendment 172969 Failed |
2023-04-18 | House | Amendment 386565 Failed |
2023-04-18 | House | Amendment 608559 Failed |
2023-04-18 | House | Amendment 088875 Failed |
2023-04-18 | House | Amendment 916215 Failed |
2023-04-18 | House | Amendment 633677 Failed |
2023-04-18 | House | Amendment 389103 Failed |
2023-04-18 | House | Amendment 388571 Failed |
2023-04-18 | House | Amendment 374289 Failed |
2023-04-18 | House | Amendment 117705 Failed |
2023-04-18 | House | Amendment 531629 Failed |
2023-04-18 | House | Amendment 289149 Failed |
2023-04-18 | House | Amendment 311545 temporarily postponed |
2023-04-18 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-18 | House | Substituted for CS/CS/HB 1421 |
2023-04-13 | House | 1st Reading (Engrossed 1) |
2023-04-13 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/18/2023) |
2023-04-13 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2023-04-05 | House | In Messages |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2023-04-04 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 27 NAYS 12 |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Ordered engrossed |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Amendment(s) failed (299002, 442004, 616390, 712462, 818468) |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (218794, 450510, 654418, 756102) |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/03/23 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Retained on Calendar |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/30/23 |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 13 NAYS 6 |
2023-03-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 03/23/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Now in Fiscal Policy |
2023-03-14 | Senate | CS by Health Policy read 1st time |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2023-03-13 | Senate | CS by Health Policy; YEAS 8 NAYS 3 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/13/23, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Fiscal Policy |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1421 (Similar To) 2023-04-18 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 254 (Ch. 2023-90)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
286 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 074 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 52 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
61 | 517 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
61 | 534 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
766 | 318 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |