FL H1421 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-18 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 254 (Ch. 2023-90)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-18 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 254 (Ch. 2023-90)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes court of state to enter, modify, or stay child custody determination under specified circumstances; prohibits persons & entities from expending funds for reimbursement for specified clinical interventions; prohibits person's biological sex from being changed on birth certificate; prohibits gender clinical interventions for minors; authorizes certain persons to refuse to participate in gender clinical interventions; prohibits health insurance policy & health maintenance contract from providing coverage for gender clinical interventions; provides physician liability & authorizes award of specified damages, fees, & costs.
Title
Gender Clinical Interventions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-27 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - House Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - House Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - House Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - House Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-18 | House | Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 254 (Ch. 2023-90) |
2023-04-18 | House | Substituted CS/SB 254 |
2023-04-13 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/18/2023) |
2023-03-29 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2023-03-29 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2023-03-28 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2023-03-28 | House | CS Filed |
2023-03-28 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2023-03-28 | House | Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee |
2023-03-27 | House | Favorable with CS by Health & Human Services Committee |
2023-03-23 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2023-03-23 | House | Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda |
2023-03-22 | House | Now in Health & Human Services Committee |
2023-03-22 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2023-03-22 | House | CS Filed |
2023-03-22 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2023-03-22 | House | Reported out of Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee |
2023-03-22 | House | Favorable with CS by Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee |
2023-03-20 | House | Added to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee agenda |
2023-03-09 | House | Now in Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee |
2023-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-03-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S254 (Similar To) 2023-05-18 - Chapter No. 2023-90
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
381 | 991 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
382 | 016 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 074 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 52 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
61 | 5175 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6411 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
766 | 318 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |