FL S0218 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-169, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1161 (Ch. 2014-215), HB 5003 (Ch. 2014-53), HB 7175 (Ch. 2014-223), SB 2514 (Ch. 2014-50)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-169, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1161 (Ch. 2014-215), HB 5003 (Ch. 2014-53), HB 7175 (Ch. 2014-223), SB 2514 (Ch. 2014-50)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring utility and television lines to be removed from county roads and highways at no cost to the county if the county finds the lines to be unreasonably interfering with the widening, repair, or reconstruction of any such road; expanding the types of vehicles that may show or display an amber light; authorizing the department to use appropriated funds for the establishment of a statewide system of interconnected multiuse trails; providing an exception for payment of certain utility work necessitated by a project on the State Highway System for municipally owned utilities or county-owned utilities located in rural areas of critical economic concern; authorizing the director of a transportation system or his or her designee to dispose of personal property found on a public transportation system, etc.
Title
Transportation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-30 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#819 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#23 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#23 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-20 | Chapter No. 2014-169, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1161 (Ch. 2014-215), HB 5003 (Ch. 2014-53), HB 7175 (Ch. 2014-223), SB 2514 (Ch. 2014-50) | |
2014-06-20 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-06-13 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2014-04-30 | House | CS passed; YEAS 117 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-29 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-04-29 | House | Substituted for CS/HB 345 |
2014-04-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-28 | House | Received |
2014-04-28 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/29/14 |
2014-04-28 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2014-04-24 | House | In Messages |
2014-04-23 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 36 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (772214, 880148) 583 |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Ordered engrossed |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (410248, 593196, 789110) |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/11/14 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | CS/CS/CS by Transportation read 1st time |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-03-26 | Senate | CS/CS/CS by- Transportation; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 03/26/14, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2014-03-18 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Now in Transportation |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Remaining references corrected to Transportation |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-03-13 | Senate | CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/13/14, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2014-03-04 | Senate | CS by Transportation read 1st time |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-03-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/06/14, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2014-02-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 02/17/14, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Now in Commerce and Tourism |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Favorable by Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2014-01-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities, 01/14/14, 10:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building |
2013-11-14 | Senate | Now in Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities |
2013-11-08 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2013-11-07 | Senate | CS by Transportation; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2013-10-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 11/07/13, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations |
2013-09-30 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0345 (Same As) 2014-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 218 (Ch. 2014-169), CS/CS/HB 1161 (Ch. 2014-215), HB 7175 (Ch. 2014-223)
H0259 (Similar To) 2013-11-05 - Withdrawn prior to introduction, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1161 (Ch. 2014-215), HB 7175 (Ch. 2014-223), CS/CS/CS/SB 218 (Ch. 2014-169)
S1048 (Similar To) 2014-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1161 (Ch. 2014-215), CS/CS/HB 7005 (Ch. 2014-216), HB 7175 (Ch. 2014-223), CS/CS/CS/SB 218 (Ch. 2014-169)
H1161 (Similar To) 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-215, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7175 (Ch. 2014-223), CS/CS/CS/SB 218 (Ch. 2014-169)
S2514 (Similar To) 2014-06-02 - Chapter No. 2014-50, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2014-51), HB 5003 (Ch. 2014-53), CS/CS/CS/SB 218 (Ch. 2014-169)
H7175 (Similar To) 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-223, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1161 (Ch. 2014-215), CS/CS/CS/SB 218 (Ch. 2014-169)
S0772 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 218 (Ch. 2014-169), CS/CS/SB 230 (Ch. 2014-171), CS/CS/CS/SB 846 (Ch. 2014-183)
S1152 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1161 (Ch. 2014-215), HB 7175 (Ch. 2014-223), CS/CS/CS/SB 218 (Ch. 2014-169)
H5003 (Similar To) 2014-06-02 - Chapter No. 2014-53, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2014-51), CS/HB 7091 (Ch. 2014-150), CS/CS/CS/SB 218 (Ch. 2014-169), SB 2514 (Ch. 2014-50)
H0259 (Similar To) 2013-11-05 - Withdrawn prior to introduction, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1161 (Ch. 2014-215), HB 7175 (Ch. 2014-223), CS/CS/CS/SB 218 (Ch. 2014-169)
S1048 (Similar To) 2014-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1161 (Ch. 2014-215), CS/CS/HB 7005 (Ch. 2014-216), HB 7175 (Ch. 2014-223), CS/CS/CS/SB 218 (Ch. 2014-169)
H1161 (Similar To) 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-215, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7175 (Ch. 2014-223), CS/CS/CS/SB 218 (Ch. 2014-169)
S2514 (Similar To) 2014-06-02 - Chapter No. 2014-50, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2014-51), HB 5003 (Ch. 2014-53), CS/CS/CS/SB 218 (Ch. 2014-169)
H7175 (Similar To) 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-223, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1161 (Ch. 2014-215), CS/CS/CS/SB 218 (Ch. 2014-169)
S0772 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 218 (Ch. 2014-169), CS/CS/SB 230 (Ch. 2014-171), CS/CS/CS/SB 846 (Ch. 2014-183)
S1152 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1161 (Ch. 2014-215), HB 7175 (Ch. 2014-223), CS/CS/CS/SB 218 (Ch. 2014-169)
H5003 (Similar To) 2014-06-02 - Chapter No. 2014-53, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2014-51), CS/HB 7091 (Ch. 2014-150), CS/CS/CS/SB 218 (Ch. 2014-169), SB 2514 (Ch. 2014-50)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
125 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 2397 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
335 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
335 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
337 | 403 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 2818 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
341 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 53 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 54 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 262 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |