FL H7175 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-223, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1161 (Ch. 2014-215), CS/CS/CS/SB 218 (Ch. 2014-169)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-223, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1161 (Ch. 2014-215), CS/CS/CS/SB 218 (Ch. 2014-169)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Removes provisions for Florida Statewide Passenger Rail Commission & transportation corporations; revises duties of Florida Transportation Commission; revises provisions relating to load limits, road projects, contractors & competitive bidding, lease-purchase agreements, conveyance of property, toll collection & video billing systems, fees from Alligator Alley tolls, M.P.O's & Metropolitan Planning Organization Advisory Council, environmental impact mitigation, Northwest Florida Transportation Corridor Authority & Tampa Bay Area Regional Transportation Authority, Pinellas Bayway, & outdoor signs; provides for sale of accounts receivable from certain leases.
Title
Department of Transportation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#680 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#680 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-20 | Chapter No. 2014-223, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1161 (Ch. 2014-215), CS/CS/CS/SB 218 (Ch. 2014-169) | |
2014-06-20 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-06-13 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2014-05-02 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 696 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Withdrawn from Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Community Affairs; Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Received |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Community Affairs; Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2014-04-24 | Senate | In Messages |
2014-04-24 | House | Passed; YEAS 118 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-23 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-04-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-21 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/14 |
2014-04-21 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2014-04-11 | House | Introduced |
2014-04-11 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0259 (Similar To) 2013-11-05 - Withdrawn prior to introduction, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1161 (Ch. 2014-215), HB 7175 (Ch. 2014-223), CS/CS/CS/SB 218 (Ch. 2014-169)
H0345 (Similar To) 2014-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 218 (Ch. 2014-169), CS/CS/HB 1161 (Ch. 2014-215), HB 7175 (Ch. 2014-223)
H1161 (Similar To) 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-215, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7175 (Ch. 2014-223), CS/CS/CS/SB 218 (Ch. 2014-169)
S0218 (Similar To) 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-169, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1161 (Ch. 2014-215), HB 5003 (Ch. 2014-53), HB 7175 (Ch. 2014-223), SB 2514 (Ch. 2014-50)
S0642 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7175 (Ch. 2014-223)
S0696 (Similar To) 2014-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7175 (Ch. 2014-223)
S1048 (Similar To) 2014-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1161 (Ch. 2014-215), CS/CS/HB 7005 (Ch. 2014-216), HB 7175 (Ch. 2014-223), CS/CS/CS/SB 218 (Ch. 2014-169)
S1152 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1161 (Ch. 2014-215), HB 7175 (Ch. 2014-223), CS/CS/CS/SB 218 (Ch. 2014-169)
S1272 (Similar To) 2014-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7005 (Ch. 2014-216), HB 7175 (Ch. 2014-223)
H0345 (Similar To) 2014-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 218 (Ch. 2014-169), CS/CS/HB 1161 (Ch. 2014-215), HB 7175 (Ch. 2014-223)
H1161 (Similar To) 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-215, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7175 (Ch. 2014-223), CS/CS/CS/SB 218 (Ch. 2014-169)
S0218 (Similar To) 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-169, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1161 (Ch. 2014-215), HB 5003 (Ch. 2014-53), HB 7175 (Ch. 2014-223), SB 2514 (Ch. 2014-50)
S0642 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7175 (Ch. 2014-223)
S0696 (Similar To) 2014-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7175 (Ch. 2014-223)
S1048 (Similar To) 2014-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1161 (Ch. 2014-215), CS/CS/HB 7005 (Ch. 2014-216), HB 7175 (Ch. 2014-223), CS/CS/CS/SB 218 (Ch. 2014-169)
S1152 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1161 (Ch. 2014-215), HB 7175 (Ch. 2014-223), CS/CS/CS/SB 218 (Ch. 2014-169)
S1272 (Similar To) 2014-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7005 (Ch. 2014-216), HB 7175 (Ch. 2014-223)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 45 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
110 | 205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 530 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 545 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
332 | 007 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
334 | 044 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
335 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
335 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
337 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
337 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
337 | 168 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
337 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
337 | 251 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
338 | 161 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
338 | 26 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 175 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 2821 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 402 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 403 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 404 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 405 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 406 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 407 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 408 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 409 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 410 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 411 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 412 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 414 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 415 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 416 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 417 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 418 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 419 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 420 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 421 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
343 | 82 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
343 | 922 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 4137 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 618 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 024 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 106 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 107 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 156 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 261 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 262 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 313 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |