FL S0214 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3-2)
Status: Passed on March 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

(THIS BILL COMBINES SR's 214 & 222) Rejecting and condemning any philosophy that espouses the superiority of one group of people over another which is hateful, dangerous, or a morally corrupt expression of intolerance, and affirming that such philosophies are contradictory to the values that define the people of Florida and the United States, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Philosophies that Espouse Superiority

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-05SenateAdopted
2020-03-05SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-03SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/05/20
2020-03-03SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-03-02SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2020-02-26SenateCS/CS by Judiciary read 1st time
2020-02-26SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/02/20, 12:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-02-21SenateNow in Rules
2020-02-20SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-19SenateCS/CS by Judiciary; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2020-02-14SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/19/20, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-01-23SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/28/20, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed
2020-01-22SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security read 1st time
2020-01-16SenateNow in Judiciary
2020-01-15SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2020-01-13SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2020-01-13SenateCS combines this bill with SR 222
2020-01-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 01/13/20, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-09-19SenateReferred to Infrastructure and Security; Judiciary; Rules
2019-09-04SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H51 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
S222 (Similar To) 2020-01-14 - Introduced

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback